PA HB18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Borough of Topton, Berks County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Borough of Topton, Berks County; authorizing the transfer of title for certain Project 70 lands owned by Lehigh County to Whitehall Township, Lehigh County; authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to Monroe County Municipal Waste Management Authority, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Stroud Township, Monroe County; and authorizing the Department of General Services and East Stroudsburg University of the State System of Higher Education, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to East Stroudsburg Borough, a certain permanent public sanitary sewer easement and certain permanent public water supply system easements situate in East Stroudsburg Borough, Monroe County.
Title
Authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Borough of Topton, Berks County, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Borough of Topton, Berks County; authorizing the transfer of title for certain Project 70 lands owned by Lehigh County to Whitehall Township, Lehigh County; authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, in exchange for the imposition of Project 70 restrictions on other lands to be acquired by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to Monroe County Municipal Waste Management Authority, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Stroud Township, Monroe County; and authorizing the Department of General Services and East Stroudsburg University of the State System of Higher Education, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to East Stroudsburg Borough, a certain permanent public sanitary sewer easement and certain permanent public water supply system easements situate in East Stroudsburg Borough, Monroe County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 18 PN 1001, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 18 PN 1001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 18 PN 38, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 18 PN 1001, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 18 PN 1001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 18 PN 38, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Act No. 2 |
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed in House |
2019-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-03-26 | House | In the House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2019-01-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-01-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-01-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |