PA HB1800 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school district financial recovery, providing for duties of receivers in certain districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school district financial recovery, providing for duties of receivers in certain districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3923, LONGIETTI (Y: 61 N: 136 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3923, TURZAI, MOT MOVE PREV QUESTION (Y: 105 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3929, BRADFORD (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3922, ISAACSON (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3924, MADDEN (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3948, KRUEGER (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3973, STURLA (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3932, KIM (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3957, KIM (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3939, ROEBUCK (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1800 PN 2886, 2019 A3956, CARROLL (Y: 91 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03763 (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Education: To Table A03763 (Y: 12 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03904 (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-06-15HouseRemoved from table
2020-06-15HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-29HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-04HouseRemoved from table
2020-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-19HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-11-18HouseReported as amended
2019-09-25HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1800
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1800&pn=2599
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1800&pn=2886
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1342
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1345
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=884
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=885
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=886
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=887
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=888
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=889
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=890
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=894

Bill Comments

feedback