PA HB1803 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 30, 2011 (P.L.81, No.18), known as the Pennsylvania Web Accountability and Transparency (PennWATCH) Act, further providing for searchable budget database and for administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for searchable budget database and for administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1803 PN 2745, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1803 PN 2567, 2019 A2939, TOEPEL (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02883 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-25SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-10-22SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2019-10-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-21HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-24HouseReported as amended
2019-09-12HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1803
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1803&pn=2446
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1803&pn=2567
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1803&pn=2745
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1121
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1122
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=707
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=726
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/22/2019&RollCallId=1236

Bill Comments

feedback