PA HB1834 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-12)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for award of grants and for expiration of authority; and establishing the Construction Savings Account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, further providing for award of grants and for expiration of authority; and establishing the Construction Savings Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1834 PN 2570, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02919 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-10-28SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-10-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-23HouseSecond consideration
2019-10-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-24HouseReported as amended
2019-09-19HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1834
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1834&pn=2521
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1834&pn=2570
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=752
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/28/2019&RollCallId=1275

Bill Comments

feedback