PA HB1860 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 24, 1945 (P.L.991, No.385), known as the Urban Redevelopment Law, further providing for definitions, for formation of authorities, for dissolution of city authorities and for eminent domain; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for formation of authorities, for dissolution of city authorities and for eminent domain; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1860 PN 2940, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1860 PN 2940, FP (Y: 173 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03926 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1860 PN 2940, FP (Y: 173 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03926 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Act No. 58 |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (173-21) |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-14 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |