PA HB1867 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, providing for the offense of unregulated transfer of custody of a child.
Title
In offenses against the family, providing for the offense of unregulated transfer of custody of a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1867 PN 3924, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1867 PN 3860, 2019 A6012, BONNER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A05884 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1867 PN 3924, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1867 PN 3860, 2019 A6012, BONNER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A05884 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Children And Youth: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-06-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |