PA HB1869 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for COVID-19 benefits for members of Pennsylvania National Guard; and, providing for COVID-19 enforcement officer disability benefits; and, in emergency medical services system, further providing for basic life support ambulances.
Title
Providing for COVID-19 benefits for members of Pennsylvania National Guard; and, providing for COVID-19 enforcement officer disability benefits; and, in emergency medical services system, further providing for basic life support ambulances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1869 PN 3582, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 3582, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 2782, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 2566, 2019 A3360, WHEELAND (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 2566, 2019 A3360, SUSP RULES, WHEELAND (Y: 191 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1869 PN 3582, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 3582, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 2782, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 2566, 2019 A3360, WHEELAND (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1869 PN 2566, 2019 A3360, SUSP RULES, WHEELAND (Y: 191 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | House | Act No. 17 |
2020-04-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-04-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-04-21 | House | Signed in House |
2020-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (202-0) |
2020-04-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-04-21 | House | In the House |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-10-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-10-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-10-22 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |