PA HB1881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school security, further providing for school police officers powers and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In school security, further providing for school police officers powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03249 (Y: 8 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-21HouseReported as committed
2019-09-26HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback