PA HB1888 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-02 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-02 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) and 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in corporate powers, further providing for personal property; and, in corporate powers, further providing for city property and affairs.
Title
In corporate powers, further providing for personal property; and, in corporate powers, further providing for city property and affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Warren Kampf [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1888 PN 2643, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1888 PN 2643, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-05-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-01 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-14 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |