PA HB1890 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the final disposition of fetal remains; and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the final disposition of fetal remains; and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1890 PN 2623, 2019 A3595, DELISSIO (Y: 82 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03549 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-29 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A03548 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-10-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-29HouseReported as committed
2019-09-26HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1890
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1890&pn=2623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=1292
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=1293
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=1294
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=813

Bill Comments

feedback