PA HB1913 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 19699, on that portion of State Route 2003 over Mahoning Creek in Big Run Borough, Jefferson County, as the SP4 James Wise, Jr., and PFC James Wingert USMC Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 19699, on that portion of State Route 2003 over Mahoning Creek in Big Run Borough, Jefferson County, as the SP4 James Wise, Jr., and PFC James Wingert USMC Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1913 PN 2676, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1913 PN 2676, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2020-01-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |