PA HB192 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 5, 1941 (P.L.752, No.286), known as the Civil Service Act, in Civil Service Commission and executive director and their powers, further providing for Civil Service Commission, for powers and duties of director and for service to State departments, boards and commissions or agencies and political subdivisions and cooperation with other civil service agencies; and, in selection of employees for entrance to or promotion in the classified service, further providing for nature of examinations.
Title
In Civil Service Commission and executive director and their powers, further providing for Civil Service Commission, for powers and duties of director and for service to State departments, boards and commissions or agencies and political subdivisions and cooperation with other civil service agencies; and, in selection of employees for entrance to or promotion in the classified service, further providing for nature of examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 192 PN 4120, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 192 PN 4120, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 192 PN 353, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 192 PN 184, 2015 A82, MCCARTER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 192 PN 4120, CONCUR (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 192 PN 4120, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 192 PN 353, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 192 PN 184, 2015 A82, MCCARTER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | House | Act No. 167 |
2016-11-21 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-11-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-27 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (184-0) |
2016-10-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-27 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2015-02-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-04 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-02-03 | House | Removed from table |
2015-01-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-01-28 | House | First consideration |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |