PA HB1925 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in revenues, further providing for transfers from State Gaming Fund.
Title
In revenues, further providing for transfers from State Gaming Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. James Santora [R] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Rep. Kurt Masser [R] |
Rep. Kate Klunk [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Nicholas Miccarelli [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1925 PN 3194, 2015 A7619, MOT RECON, REED (Y: 145 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1925 PN 3194, 2015 A7622, MOT RECON, MUSTIO (Y: 157 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1925 PN 3194, 2015 A7619, PAYNE (Y: 81 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1925 PN 3194, 2015 A7622, PAYNE (Y: 66 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A06578 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1925 PN 3194, 2015 A7622, MOT RECON, MUSTIO (Y: 157 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1925 PN 3194, 2015 A7619, PAYNE (Y: 81 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1925 PN 3194, 2015 A7622, PAYNE (Y: 66 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A06578 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |