PA HB1947 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for license without restriction.
Title
Further providing for license without restriction.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Louis Schmitt [R] |
Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Dan Frankel [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2727, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1947 PN 2727, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-28 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-21 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |