PA HB195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-18)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for medication synchronization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for medication synchronization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 195 PN 167, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 195 PN 167, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02SenateAct No. 46
2019-07-02SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-06-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-06-27SenateSigned in Senate
2019-06-27SenateSigned in House
2019-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-10SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-10SenateReported as committed
2019-02-08SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2019-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2019-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-01-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-01-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-01-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-01-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-01-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-01-29HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=195
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0195&pn=0167
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=01/29/2019&RollCallId=1
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=19
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2019&RollCallId=11
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/10/2019&RollCallId=242
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=238

Bill Comments

feedback