PA HB1952 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 14, 1961 (P.L.604, No.304), known as The Apprenticeship and Training Act, further providing for administration; providing for supervision; and abrogating a regulation.
Title
Further providing for administration; providing for supervision; and abrogating a regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-14 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |