PA HB1954 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-13)
Status: Engrossed on September 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15552, carrying U.S. Route 219 over Elk Creek, Ridgway Borough, Elk County, as the Elk County Vietnam Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15552, carrying U.S. Route 219 over Elk Creek, Ridgway Borough, Elk County, as the Elk County Vietnam Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1954 PN 3921, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05855 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1954 PN 3921, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05855 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-09-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-14 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |