PA HB196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, organizing the Judiciary into representative districts and further providing for residency requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, organizing the Judiciary into representative districts and further providing for residency requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1156, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1154, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1148, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 90 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1147, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1145, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 87 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1143, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 89 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1142, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1141, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1140, GERMANE, DIAMOND (Y: 90 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1011, BRIGGS (Y: 88 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - House Floor: HB 196 PN 168, 2019 A1008, RABB (Y: 89 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-20HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-07HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-01HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-30HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=196
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0196&pn=0168
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=404
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=405
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=266
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=267
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=269
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=270
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=271
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=272
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=273
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=274
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=275
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=276
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/08/2019&RollCallId=486

Bill Comments

feedback