PA HB1961 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in State Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for individual investment accounts, for participant contributions, for employer defined contributions, for vesting, for powers and duties of board, for investments based on participant's investment allocation choices and for expenses; in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board and for taxation, attachment and assignment of funds; and making a related repeal.
Title
In State Employees' Defined Contribution Plan, further providing for individual investment accounts, for participant contributions, for employer defined contributions, for vesting, for powers and duties of board, for investments based on participant's investment allocation choices and for expenses; in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the board and for taxation, attachment and assignment of funds; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1961 PN 4478, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1961 PN 4478, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1961 PN 2703, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1961 PN 4478, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1961 PN 4478, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1961 PN 2703, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Act No. 94 |
2020-10-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-10-20 | House | In the House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-09-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-28 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |