PA HB1981 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the establishment of first-time home buyer savings accounts for first-time home buyers in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1981 PN 4198, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1981 PN 3323, 2017 A6949, BIZZARRO (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1981 PN 3323, 2017 A9567, R. BROWN (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06328 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06278 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06318 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1981 PN 3323, 2017 A6949, BIZZARRO (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1981 PN 3323, 2017 A9567, R. BROWN (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06328 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06278 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06318 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-31 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2018-10-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-1) |
2018-10-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-11 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |