PA HB1984 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-10)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for petition for involuntary termination and providing for special provisions when child conceived as a result of rape or incest.
Title
In proceedings prior to petition to adopt, further providing for petition for involuntary termination and providing for special provisions when child conceived as a result of rape or incest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1984 PN 2789, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1984 PN 2789, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1984 PN 2789, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 95 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-04-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-21 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |