PA HB1995 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Keystone Solvency Operating Study Commission and providing for its powers and duties and for a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Keystone Solvency Operating Study Commission and providing for its powers and duties and for a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1995 PN 4078, FP (Y: 117 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1995 PN 3260, 2019 A6134, RYAN (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04633 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04410 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-07-08SenateIn the Senate
2020-07-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (117-84)
2020-07-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-07-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-15HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-28HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-02-03HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-03HouseFirst consideration
2020-02-03HouseReported as amended
2019-10-25HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1995
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1995&pn=2798
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1995&pn=3260
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1995&pn=4078
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/03/2020&RollCallId=1684
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/03/2020&RollCallId=1685
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/03/2020&RollCallId=1688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1471
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1502
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/08/2020&RollCallId=2349

Bill Comments

feedback