PA HB1996 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in administration relating to retirement for school employees, further providing for Public School Employees' Retirement Board and for administrative duties of board; and, in administration relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for the State Employees' Retirement Board and for administrative duties of the board.
Title
In administration relating to retirement for school employees, further providing for Public School Employees' Retirement Board and for administrative duties of board; and, in administration relating to retirement for State employees and officers, further providing for the State Employees' Retirement Board and for administrative duties of the board.
Sponsors
Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Stephen Barrar [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] |
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Susan Helm [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] |
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Mark Gillen [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |