PA HB2000 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the portion of County Line Road between Warminster Road and Newtown Road in Montgomery County as the Captain William J. Ahlum Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating the portion of County Line Road between Warminster Road and Newtown Road in Montgomery County as the Captain William J. Ahlum Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2000 PN 2805, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2000 PN 2805, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |