PA HB2011 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-07 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-07 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 2, 1947 (P.L.143, No.62), entitled "An act regulating the sale and resale for profit and the carrying on of the business of selling or reselling tickets or other devices for admission to places of amusement; providing for the licensing of persons reselling such tickets for profit; providing for the suspension and revocation of such licenses; imposing duties on licensees and owners or operators of places of amusement; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Revenue, county treasurers, district attorneys, and the receiver of taxes, and city solicitors in cities of the first class; making disposition of moneys collected and providing penalties," further providing for definitions; and providing for ticket purchasing software and for penalties.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 2, 1947 (P.L.143, No.62), entitled "An act regulating the sale and resale for profit and the carrying on of the business of selling or reselling tickets or other devices for admission to places of amusement; providing for the licensing of persons reselling such tickets for profit; providing for the suspension and revocation of such licenses; imposing duties on licensees and owners or operators of places of amusement; imposing powers and duties on the Department of Revenue, county treasurers, district attorneys, and the receiver of taxes, and city solicitors in cities of the first class; making disposition of moneys collected and providing penalties," further providing for definitions; and providing for ticket purchasing software and for penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-07 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2008-10-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-09-24 | Second consideration | |
2008-09-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-05-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-05-14 | Removed from table | |
2008-05-13 | Laid on the table | |
2008-05-13 | First consideration | |
2008-05-13 | Reported as amended | |
2007-11-14 | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2011 |