PA HB2011 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-21 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-21 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board established.
Title
Further providing for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-19 - House - HB 2011 PN 2748, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-21 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2011-12-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-12-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2011-12-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-12-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-15 | House | Second consideration |
2011-12-14 | House | Removed from table |
2011-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2011-11-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-10-04 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |