PA HB2012 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 56, partially in Seward Borough, Westmoreland County, and partially in East Wheatfield Township, Indiana County, over the Conemaugh River as the Pfc. James E. Ludwig Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 56, partially in Seward Borough, Westmoreland County, and partially in East Wheatfield Township, Indiana County, over the Conemaugh River as the Pfc. James E. Ludwig Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2014-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |