PA HB2026 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-11)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-06 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on December 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-06 - Removed from table
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in health and accident insurance, providing for group health policies to continue for period of time after termination of employment or membership in health maintenance organizations.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in health and accident insurance, providing for group health policies to continue for period of time after termination of employment or membership in health maintenance organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-06 | Removed from table | |
2008-10-06 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-27 | Removed from table | |
2008-06-27 | Laid on the table | |
2008-05-14 | Removed from table | |
2008-05-14 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-02-13 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-02-13 | Removed from table | |
2008-02-12 | Laid on the table | |
2008-02-12 | First consideration | |
2008-02-12 | Reported as amended | |
2007-12-06 | Referred to INSURANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2026 |