PA HB2039 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 2015 (P.L.497, No.90), known as the Taxpayer-Funded Advertising Transparency Act, further providing for definitions and for advertising notification; and making a related repeal.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for advertising notification; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-02 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |