PA HB2044 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of May 16, 1919 (P.L. 193, No. 120), entitled "An act to provide for the licensing and regulation of public dance halls and ball rooms, and for the regulation, supervision of public dances and balls in cities of the first, second, and third classes."
Title
Repealing the act of May 16, 1919 (P.L. 193, No. 120), entitled "An act to provide for the licensing and regulation of public dance halls and ball rooms, and for the regulation, supervision of public dances and balls in cities of the first, second, and third classes."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2871, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2044 PN 2871, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-29 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-22 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |