PA HB2056 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2056 PN 3800, FP (Y: 167 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2056 PN 2969, 2019 A5430, D. MILLER (Y: 96 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2056 PN 2969, 2019 A5431, D. MILLER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2056 PN 3800, FP (Y: 167 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2056 PN 2969, 2019 A5430, D. MILLER (Y: 96 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2056 PN 2969, 2019 A5431, D. MILLER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-05-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (167-35) |
2020-05-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-12-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |