PA HB2089 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, further providing for powers of the board of township commissioners as to building and housing regulations and inspectors; and providing for Uniform Construction Code, property maintenance code and reserved powers.
Title
Further providing for powers of the board of township commissioners as to building and housing regulations and inspectors; and providing for Uniform Construction Code, property maintenance code and reserved powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-02 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |