PA HB2103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-02 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 24, 2018 (P.L.719, No.112), known as the Patient Test Result Information Act, further providing for definitions, for test results and for duties of Department of Health.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for test results and for duties of Department of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2103 PN 4381, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07161 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2103 PN 4381, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07161 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2020-09-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-12-02 | House | Referred to HEALTH |