PA HB2113 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, establishing the Public-Private Partnership Pilot Program and the State Public-Private Partnership Board.
Title
Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Pilot Program and the State Public-Private Partnership Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Eli Evankovich [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Bryan Cutler [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Rep. Stanley Saylor [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A09123 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08528 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08527 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08512 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A09123 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08528 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08527 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A08512 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A09123 (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-05-27 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |