PA HB2123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the Faxon Interchange of Interstate 180 at Northway Road in Loyalsock Township, Lycoming County, as the Sgt. Thomas Woodruff, Sr., and Sgt. Hamilton Woodruff Memorial Interchange.
Title
Designating the Faxon Interchange of Interstate 180 at Northway Road in Loyalsock Township, Lycoming County, as the Sgt. Thomas Woodruff, Sr., and Sgt. Hamilton Woodruff Memorial Interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2123 PN 3149, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04475 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2123 PN 3149, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04475 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-09-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-09-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-09-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-01 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-15 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |