PA HB2152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-08 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the disposal of hospice or home health care patient medication.
Title
Providing for the disposal of hospice or home health care patient medication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2152 PN 3196, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2152 PN 3196, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2018-06-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to HEALTH |