PA HB2173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in the State System of Higher Education, further providing for purposes and general powers, for rental fees and other charges and for annual report and providing for student records.
Title
In the State System of Higher Education, further providing for purposes and general powers, for rental fees and other charges and for annual report and providing for student records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2173 PN 3203, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2173 PN 3203, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-25 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2020-05-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-05 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |