PA HB2259 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of July 12, 1935 (P.L.970, No.314), known as the Individual Net Income Tax Act.
Title
Repealing the act of July 12, 1935 (P.L.970, No.314), known as the Individual Net Income Tax Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2259 PN 3240, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2259 PN 3240, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-04-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-21 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-05 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to FINANCE |