PA HB2296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for learners' permits, for examination of applicant for driver's license and for restrictions on drivers' licenses; in commercial drivers, further providing for notification requirements for drivers, for requirement for commercial driver's license, for commercial driver's license qualification standards and for disqualification; and in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for learners' permits, for examination of applicant for driver's license and for restrictions on drivers' licenses; in commercial drivers, further providing for notification requirements for drivers, for requirement for commercial driver's license, for commercial driver's license qualification standards and for disqualification; and in fees, further providing for exemption of persons, entities and vehicles from fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2296 PN 4542, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2296 PN 4542, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2296 PN 3305, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2296 PN 4542, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2296 PN 4542, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2296 PN 3305, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | House | Act No. 131 |
2020-11-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-11-19 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-11-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-11-18 | House | Signed in House |
2020-11-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-11-18 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-10-21 | House | In the House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-07-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-07 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |