PA HB2322 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school districts, further providing for how constituted.
Title
In school districts, further providing for how constituted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06316 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06316 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-11-17 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |