PA HB233 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 28, 1953 (P.L.723, No.230), known as the Second Class County Code, in special powers and duties of the county, further providing for flags to decorate graves.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In special powers and duties of the county, further providing for flags to decorate graves.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 233 PN 203, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as committed
2019-02-08SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2019-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2019-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-01-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-01-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-01-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-01-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-01-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-01-29HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=233
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0233&pn=0203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=01/29/2019&RollCallId=3
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=20
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2019&RollCallId=12
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=268

Bill Comments

feedback