PA HB2351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in fraud and abuse control, further providing for definitions and for provider prohibited acts, criminal penalties and civil remedies.
Title
In fraud and abuse control, further providing for definitions and for provider prohibited acts, criminal penalties and civil remedies.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendi Thomas [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R] |
Rep. Clinton Owlett [R] | Rep. Thomas Sankey [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. Stanley Saylor [R] |
Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Kate Klunk [R] |
Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. Jack Rader [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] |
Rep. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2351 PN 3912, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A06111 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2351 PN 3912, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A06111 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2020-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |