PA HB2354 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-08 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-08 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for township manager.
Title
Further providing for township manager.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Richard Grucela [D] | Rep. David Kessler [D] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-09-21 - House - HB 2354 PN 3407, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-08 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-09-21 | In the Senate | |
2010-09-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-20 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-21 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-21 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-20 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-20 | First consideration | |
2010-04-20 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |