PA HB2354 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-30 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-30 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 26, 1947 (P.L.318, No.140), known as the CPA Law, further providing for certificate requirements, for equivalency practice for individuals and for equivalency practice for firms and entities.
Title
Further providing for certificate requirements, for equivalency practice for individuals and for equivalency practice for firms and entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-29 - House - HB 2354 PN 3831, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-30 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2012-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2012-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2012-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-26 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-26 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2012-05-08 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |