PA HB2355 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for medical assistance managed care organization rate setting.
Title
In public assistance, providing for medical assistance managed care organization rate setting.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Sankey [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R] |
Rep. Clinton Owlett [R] | Rep. Wendi Thomas [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. Stanley Saylor [R] |
Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Kate Klunk [R] |
Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. Jack Rader [R] | Rep. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2355 PN 3914, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A06104 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2355 PN 3914, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A06104 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2020-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |