PA HB2369 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 29, 1996 (P.L.434, No.67), known as the Job Enhancement Act, in Community Development Bank Grant and Loan Program, further providing for definitions and providing for COVID-19 grant and loan programs.
Title
In Community Development Bank Grant and Loan Program, further providing for definitions and providing for COVID-19 grant and loan programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2369 PN 3857, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05897 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2369 PN 3601, CUTLER, MOT RECMT FINANCE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05107 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2369 PN 3857, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05897 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2369 PN 3601, CUTLER, MOT RECMT FINANCE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05107 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2020-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-09 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-27 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-28 | House | Re-committed to FINANCE (202-0) |
2020-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-03-23 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |