PA HB2370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 57 (Notaries Public) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial act performed by remotely located individual and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.
Title
In Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial act performed by remotely located individual and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2370 PN 4061, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2370 PN 4061, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2370 PN 3659, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2370 PN 3603, 2019 A5234, M. K. KELLER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05110 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2370 PN 4061, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2370 PN 3659, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2370 PN 3603, 2019 A5234, M. K. KELLER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05110 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | House | Act No. 97 |
2020-10-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-10-20 | House | In the House |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-04-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-03-23 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |