PA HB2388 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Motion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained May 20, 2020 (115-87)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Motion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained May 20, 2020 (115-87)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, MOT OVERRIDE (Y: 115 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, CONCUR (Y: 123 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5600, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-5600 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5572, SCHWANK AMENDMENT NO. A-5572 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5585, FONTANA AMENDMENT NO. A-5585 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5617, WILLIAMS, ANTHONY H. AMENDMENT NO. A-5617 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2388 PN 3592, FP (Y: 113 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2388 PN 3535, 2019 A5095, BRADFORD (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, CONCUR (Y: 123 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5600, WILLIAMS, LINDSEY AMENDMENT NO. A-5600 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5572, SCHWANK AMENDMENT NO. A-5572 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5585, FONTANA AMENDMENT NO. A-5585 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2388 PN 3719, A5617, WILLIAMS, ANTHONY H. AMENDMENT NO. A-5617 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2388 PN 3592, FP (Y: 113 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2388 PN 3535, 2019 A5095, BRADFORD (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Senate | Motion to override the Governor's Veto defeated, and the Governor's Veto sustained May 20, 2020 (115-87) |
2020-05-19 | Senate | In the House |
2020-05-19 | House | Veto No. 5 |
2020-05-19 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2020-05-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (123-79) |
2020-05-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-05-13 | House | In the House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-17) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-05-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2020-04-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-89) |
2020-04-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-13 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |