PA HB239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 27, 1991 (P.L.70, No.10), entitled "An act requiring the superintendent of every public school district to make available, upon request, lists of graduating seniors to armed forces recruiters; and providing a penalty for the misuse of any such lists," further providing for title and for legislative intent; providing for short title and for definitions; and further providing for list of seniors to be compiled, for optional compliance by nonpublic schools and for reimbursement of costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of June 27, 1991 (P.L.70, No.10), entitled "An act requiring the superintendent of every public school district to make available, upon request, lists of graduating seniors to armed forces recruiters; and providing a penalty for the misuse of any such lists," further providing for title and for legislative intent; providing for short title and for definitions; and further providing for list of seniors to be compiled, for optional compliance by nonpublic schools and for reimbursement of costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-17HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback