PA HB2392 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for definitions and for duties of office.
Title
In Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for definitions and for duties of office.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Maria Donatucci [D] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] |
Rep. Torren Ecker [R] | Rep. Summer Lee [D] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Rep. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2392 PN 3644, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2392 PN 3541, 2019 A5205, KOSIEROWSKI (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - House - House Floor: HB 2392 PN 3644, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2392 PN 3541, 2019 A5205, KOSIEROWSKI (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-13 | House | Referred to FINANCE |